Venue: Tea Room - Council House. View directions
Contact: Rav Kalsi Senior Governance Officer
No. | Item | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Apologies for absence Minutes: Councillor Azad Choudhry – other Council business Councillor Pat Ferguson - unwell |
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Declarations of Interests Minutes: None. |
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
To confirm the minutes of the following meetings:
· Overview and Scrutiny Call-in Panel 30 March 2016 · Overview and Scrutiny Committee 6 April 2016 · Overview and Scrutiny Call-in Panel 12 April 2016
Additional documents: Minutes: The following minutes were confirmed and signed by the Chair:
· Overview and Scrutiny Call-in Panel on 30 March 2016 · Overview and Scrutiny Committee on 6 April 2016 · Overview and Scrutiny Call-in Panel on 12 April 2016 |
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Appointment of Vice-Chair Minutes: RESOLVED to appoint Councillor Gul Khan as Vice-Chair for the municipal year 2016/2017.
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Report of the Head of Democratic Services Minutes: The Committee considered the Terms of Reference agreed at Annual Council on 9 May 2016.
RESOLVED to note the terms of reference for Overview and Scrutiny Committee.
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Establishment of Overview and Scrutiny Committee Sub-Committees 2016/17 PDF 113 KB Report of the Head of Democratic Services Minutes: The Committee considered the appointments and terms of reference of its sub committees (the Call-in Panel, and Scrutiny Review Panels) and the appointment of the five scrutiny chairs.
RESOLVED
(1) to appoint the following Councillors as Chairs of the Scrutiny Review Panels:
Councillor Brian Parbutt Councillor Anne Peach Councillor Glyn Jenkins Councillor Sue Johnson Councillor Azad Choudhry
(2) to approve the terms of reference and membership of the Call-in Panel and to appoint:
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Appointment of Co-Optees on Overview and Scrutiny PDF 204 KB Report of the Head of Democratic Services Minutes: The Committee considered the arrangements for co-option to the Overview and Scrutiny Committee and/or its sub committees.
RESOLVED
(1) to appoint David Richards (as Church of England Diocese representative) and Ken Daly (as Roman Catholic Diocese representative) for scrutiny of education matters;
(3) to note that Assim Ishaque has 1 years remaining as a statutory co-opted Parent Governor Representative for scrutiny of education matters;
(4) to appoint Beverley Frost as a non-statutory co-opted Third Sector Advocate for the municipal year 2016/17.
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Dates of future meetings 2016 2017
6 July 4 January 7 September 8 February 5 October 8 March 9 November 5 April 7 December
Minutes: RESOLVED to meet on the following Wednesday’s at 2.00 pm:
|